THE BRITISH SPORTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of vocational courses, training programmes qualifications and awards to educate people, particularly young people, including those considered to be in financial hardship, in leadership and organisation of sport and physical activity. The delivery of programmes which encourage people to then use those skills in a voluntary capacity to get their communities more active.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£2,007,959
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.99m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £20.53k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,133,550
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.06m | |
Other | £72.86k |
£73,855 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £270,792 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £72.86k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.06m |
People

39 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 January 2003: Standard registration
- Leadership Skills Foundation (Working name)
- SPORTS LEADERS UK (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Matthew | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dan Dodge | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tulip | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire de Silva | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gulnaz Raja | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Euan Spence | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth North | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Cameron | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Norrington | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Jill Lanning | Trustee | 28 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ramsey | Trustee | 28 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.17m | £1.73m | £1.98m | £2.12m | £2.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.01m | £1.74m | £1.79m | £2.15m | £2.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £352.63k | £353.65k | £270.79k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £219.05k | £161.10k | £2.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.94m | £1.56m | £1.97m | £2.10m | £1.99m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.08k | £10.64k | £11.12k | £21.04k | £20.53k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.01m | £1.74m | £1.79m | £2.15m | £2.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £16.90k | £17.37k | £18.96k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £72.86k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £32.78k | £25.44k | £26.34k | £17.45k | £9.39k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £532.87k | £606.72k | |
|
Other assets | £1.81m | £1.71m | £1.71m | £1.18m | £1.01m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £544.11k | £453.39k | £264.22k | £249.37k | £197.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2011 as amended on 26 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
3.1. THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, COURSES, TRAINING PROGRAMMES AND RESOURCES TO ENABLE, ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS, INCLUDING THOSE CONSIDERED TO BE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN LEADERSHIP, COACHING AND ORGANISATION OF SPORT AND PHYSICAL RECREATION; AND 3.2. THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF ANY CHARITABLE BODIES, OR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, AS THE TRUSTEES, MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
British Sports Trust
Bradwell Road
Loughton Lodge
MILTON KEYNES
MK8 9LA
- Phone:
- 01908689180
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window