FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH CITY CENTRE PARISH SOUTHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Religion and the preservation for the public benefit of a building of special architectural and historic importance by the beautification, preservation and maintenance of the fabric and furnishings of the Parish Church of St Mary's, Southampton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southampton City
Governance
- 09 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Scoggins | Chair | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Michael Auger | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JONATHAN MARK FINCH | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|||||
AUDREY HOBBS | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
VILMA MAY SCOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15k | £154 | £10 | £364 | £1.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260 | £0 | £0 | £10.95k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF SPECIAL ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC IMPORTANCE BY THE BEAUTIFICATION, PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND FURNISHINGS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY'S IN SOUTHAMPTON
Area of benefit
PARISH CHURCH IN SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chair, Friends of St Mary's
c/o Saint Mary's Office
St Marys (Lodge Road)
9-19 Rose Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 6TE
- Phone:
- 023 8033 0851
- Email:
- hello@saintmaryschurch.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window