SMARTRISK FOUNDATION - UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Smartrisk works to reduce the number of preventable injuries by providing educational programmes within schools across the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 2003: Standard registration
- 18 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SMARTRISK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23k | £87 | £34 | £34 | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.49k | £6.71k | £8.42k | £11.59k | £10.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 03 October 2019 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 16 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) TO INCREASE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF MEASURES TO PREVENT INJURIES BY PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATION, DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION AND PUBLICATION OF ARTICLES IN JOURNALS AND THE LIKE AND WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING IN PARTICULAR TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUCH MATTERS (B) TO CONDUCT AND SPONSOR RESEARCH INTO INJURY PREVENTION TECHNIQUES AND INJURY TREATMENT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN THE FIELDS OF INJURY PREVENTION AND SAFETY DEVICES (C) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT FOR LOCAL PROGRAMMES OF INJURY PREVENTION TO MONITOR AND MEASURE THEIR EFFECTIVENESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window