ARGENTINA IN NEED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN BUENOS AIRES, ARGENTINA,BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO HOGAR EL ALBA ORPHANAGE AND ALSO TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY IN THE INDIGENOUS INDIAN COMMUNITIES OF THE CHACO REGION OF N/ARGENTINA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCE FOR THE SINKING OF WELLS FOR FRESH WATER,AND THE BUILDING OF SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITY FACILITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Argentina
Governance
- 17 February 2003: Standard registration
- 20 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.75k | £5.23k | £3.72k | £3.72k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.52k | £3.48k | £3.86k | £4.04k | £3.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 16 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 16 March 2013 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN ARGENTINA BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO HOGAR EL ALBA SCHOOL AND ESCUELA CRISTIANA EVANGELICA ARGENTINA BURZACO. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN SALTA, ARGENTINA PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO THE SOUP KITCHEN AND HOLGA EL ALBA ORPHANAGE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES (AS DEFINED BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES) WITHIN ARGENTINA, AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE..
Area of benefit
SALTA, ARGENTINA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window