BURNHOLME COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are children's day nursery and operate in a local community. We offer care and education to children under 5 years old
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 26 June 2003: Standard registration
- Burnholme Day Nursery (Working name)
- Burnholme Nursery (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN TINA TODMAN | Chair | 20 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Sarah Neale | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harrison | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nina Holliday | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Martin Todman | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kate Adamson | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.82k | £223.18k | £233.84k | £236.44k | £279.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.38k | £201.20k | £216.95k | £225.01k | £255.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 13 FEBRUARY 2003 as amended on 24 Jun 2024 as amended on 26 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
I. To advance quality care and education for young children (primarily under statutory school age) by promoting learning and offering a relevant and appropriate programme of activities which will take into account cultural, religious and social backgrounds. II. To enhance the whole development (physical, social and emotional) of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local area III. To offer opportunities for parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of the nursery and where possible the wider community.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Centre
Mossdale Avenue
York
YO31 0HA
- Phone:
- 01904 551702
- Email:
- burnholmenursery@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window