Trustees BURNHOLME COMMUNITY NURSERY
Charity Number: 1098211

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN TINA TODMAN | Chair | 20 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Sarah Neale | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harrison | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nina Holliday | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Martin Todman | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kate Adamson | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.