Financial history AL GHAZALI MULTI-CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1098748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £204.94k £159.82k £232.44k £301.90k £285.64k
Total expenditure £192.88k £158.83k £206.64k £262.35k £286.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £63.51k £88.50k £159.34k