THE MANGO TREE ORPHAN SUPPORT PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We spend our charitable income on supporting projects in Kenya, Tanzania, Malawi and Uganda which provide access to education and training for orphans vulnerable children and young people. We also invest in sustainable livelihoods work to increase household security and income levels to lift the poorest families out of poverty so that they can access education for the most disadvantaged children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 03 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Kipling | Chair | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Moore | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Peter Buturo | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Olivia White | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £547.01k | £355.84k | £499.71k | £465.27k | £496.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £738.67k | £435.60k | £421.61k | £542.31k | £436.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £545.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £705.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £33.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £691.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DATED 13TH NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 10TH SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST CHILDREN RESIDENT IN TANZANIA AND OTHER COUNTRIES IN AFRICA WHO HAVE LOST ONE OR BOTH PARENTS THROUGH HIV, AIDS OR RELATED CONDITIONS OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE SUFFERING FROM HIV INFECTION, AIDS OR RELATED CONDITIONS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY 1)PROVIDING HEALTHCARE AND COUNSELLING TO THOSE CHILDREN AND MEMBERS OF THE FAMILY 2) PROVIDING A TRANSPORT SERVICE TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO ACCESS SERVICES MORE EASILY 3) PROVIDING EDUCATION IN ALL HEALTH MATTERS RELATING TO THE SAFEGUARDING OF GOOD HEALTH PARTICULARLY THOSE ASSOCIATED WITH THE EFFECTS OF HIV INFECTION AND AIDS 4)PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THE CONTINUING EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF ORPHANS 5)PROVIDING SUPPORT TO THOSE CHILDREN, MEMBERS OF THEIR FAMILY AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO PROMOTE SUCH SUPPORT FOR INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
TANZANIA, AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Kids Club Kampala
148 Witton Lodge Road
BIRMINGHAM
B23 5AP
- Phone:
- 07971601154
- Email:
- info@kidsclubkampala.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window