UK PAKISTAN WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are registered with {OISC} Office of the Immigration Services Commissioner ( Reg- N201800013) at level 2, to provide Immigration advice and offer Immigration Services - Not- For- profit, We do not get any funding or grant from any resoces, we collect donastion from people who used our services, I am the immigration adviser at level 2, I am working bvoiluntary,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Cambridgeshire
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Lancashire
- Leicestershire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 August 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAWAID IQBAL CHAUDHRY | Chair | 28 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
MRS U. IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £575 | £470 | £571 | £563 | £418 | |
|
Total expenditure | £575 | £467 | £570 | £562 | £417 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 13 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PAKISTANI AND OTHER INHABITANTS ON CITY OF MANCHESTER (HEREINAFTER CALLED; THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OF OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY), IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.) A). FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AN IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE OF PAKISTANI ORIGIN BY RELIEVING THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY, SICKNESS, AGE OR INFIRMITY BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS, AND; B) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PAKISTANI REFUGEES WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO ARE INTENDING TO RESIDE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS IMMIGRATION, FINANCE, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH, HOUSING, SOCIAL SECURITY, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 TURNBULL ROAD
LONGSIGHT
MANCHESTER
M13 0PZ
- Phone:
- 01612242705
- Email:
- jawaid144@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window