Stanburn Primary School

Charity number: 1096825
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School based activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £62,942
Total expenditure: £61,901

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Harrow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 April 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STANBURN FIRST SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS L MARTIN-BRANCH Chair
None on record
Elaine West Trustee 19 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.13k £4.22k £65.28k £77.74k £62.94k
Total expenditure £88.67k £3.92k £61.31k £77.29k £61.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 February 2025 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 February 2024 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 February 2024 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 May 2023 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 May 2023 100 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stanburn Primary School
Abercorn Road
STANMORE
Middlesex
HA7 2PJ
Phone:
02089541423