Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF HULL PARAGON

Charity number: 1096029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 August 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 July 2023 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required