WYCHAVON FESTIVAL OF BRASS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping to educate young people in the playing of Brass Band Music and the composing of Brass Band Music. Running events for brass bands which help to improve their playing and presentation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 September 2003: Standard registration
- 20 July 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1167590 WYCHAVON FESTIVAL OF BRASS
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.31k | £15.93k | £17.66k | £13.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.11k | £13.41k | £13.53k | £13.47k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.90k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 26 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 10 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 05 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 29 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BRASS BAND MUSIC. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSICIANS, ARRANGERS AND COMPOSERS IN BRASS BAND MUSIC. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ALL ASPECTS OF BRASS BAND MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window