THANET U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education,Art study and creation. Sport and recreation. General interest development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 08 January 2003: Standard registration
- THANET USA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Andrew Trevethick | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Monica Holding | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick George Hall | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eileen Harvey | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Inge Marie Castle | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Holding | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Symonds | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rosemary Pitt | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.05k | £7.54k | £8.15k | £16.16k | £16.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.09k | £9.53k | £6.02k | £15.91k | £17.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
THANET AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Masons Rise
BROADSTAIRS
CT10 1AY
- Phone:
- 01843864969
- Email:
- janpitt10@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window