THE KERYGMA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works through Eden Community Church in Carlisle, to further develop the Christian faith both to the existing congregation and by reaching out to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 29 July 2003: Standard registration
- 04 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.11k | £8.42k | £9.38k | £6.56k | £5.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.65k | £7.71k | £8.26k | £7.60k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 21 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 14 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES :- 1. THE FULL INSPIRATION OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES; THEIR AUTHORITY AND SUFFICIENTLY AS NOT ONLY CONTAINING BUT BEING IN THEMSELVES THE WORD OF GOD; THE RELIABILITY OF THE NEW TESTAMENT IN ITS TESTIMONY TO THE CHARACTER AND AUTHORSHIP OF THE OLD TESTAMENT; AND THE NEED OF THE TEACHING OF THE HOLY SPIRIT TO A TRUE AND SPIRITUAL UNDERSTANDING OF THE WHOLE. 2. THE UNITY OF THE GODHEAD AND THE DIVINE CO-EQUALITY OF THE FATHER THE SON AND THE HOLY SPIRIT, THE SOVEREIGNTY OF GOD IN HIS CREATION PROVIDENCE AND REDEMPTION. 3. THE UTTER DEPRAVITY OF HUMAN NATURE IN CONSEQUENCE OF THE FALL AND THE NECESSITY FOR THE REGENERATION. 4. THE TRUE AND PROPER DEITY OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST , HIS VIRGIN BIRTH HIS REAL AND PERFECT MANHOOD; THE AUTHORITY OF HIS TEACHING AND THE INFALLIBILITY OF ALL HIS UTTERANCES HIS WORK OF ATONEMENT FOR SINNERS OF MANKIND BY HIS VICARIOUS SUFFERINGS AND DEATH; HIS BODILY RESURRECTION AND HIS ASCENSION INTO HEAVEN; HIS PRESENT PRIESTLY INTERCESSION FOR HIS PEOPLE; AND HIS FUNCTION AS THE BAPTISE WITH THE HOLY SPIRIT. 5. THE JUSTIFICATION OF THE SINNER SOLELY BY FAITH THROUGH THE ATONING MERITS OF OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST. 6. THE NECESSITY OF THE WORK OF THE HOLY SPIRIT IN REGENERATION CONVERSION AND SANCTIFICATION; ALSO IN MINISTRY AND WORSHIP AND IN THE EXERCISING OF SPIRITUAL GIFTS THROUGH THE BODY OF BELIEVERS. 7. THE RESURRECTION OF THE BODY; THE JUDGEMENT OF THE WORLD BY THE LORD JESUS CHRIST WITH THE ETERNAL BLESSEDNESS OF THE RIGHTEOUS AND THE ETERNAL PUNISHMENT OF THE WICKED. 8. THE OBSERVANCE OF BAPTISM BY IMMERSION OF BELIEVERS AS AN ORDINANCE OF DIVINE INSTITUTION; THE LORD'S SUPPER AS A COMMEMORATION OF OUR LORD'S DEATH BUT NOT AS BEING A SACRIFICE FOR SIN OR INVOLVING ANY CHANGE IN THE SUBSTANCE OF BREAD AND WINE. 9. THE PERSONAL RETURN OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST FOR HIS CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window