FRIENDS OF ROPNER PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise events and band concerts in Ropner Park. Provide healthy home baked food and snacks in the cafe. Encourage recreational use of the park by individuals, families and groups. Encourage art, photographic groups and schools to use the park, portray their favourite scenes, and to display their work in the cafe if they wish. Liase with Stockton Council on future works and events within the park
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £8,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 21 July 2008: Standard registration
- FORP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STAN TAYLORSON | Chair | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gary Whiteside | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hasthorpe | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Christina Whiteside | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mulloy | Trustee | 22 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.50k | £157.01k | £253.14k | £264.97k | £301.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.69k | £146.29k | £254.30k | £264.81k | £307.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £8.80k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOCKTON-ON-TEES AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF ROPNER PARK.
Area of benefit
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Springfield Avenue
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Cleveland
TS18 4EH
- Phone:
- 01642614459
- Email:
- forpchairman@talktalk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window