CHRIS WESTWOOD CHARITY FOR CHILDREN WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial assistance to fund the purchase of:Special exercise equipment, walkers, & standing frames, to assist in regaining & maintaining mobility, wheelchairs, special mobility chairs, car seats, special seating, special beds, support & lifting equipment, sensory equipment, vision equipment,and other specialised facilities that may be required to enable the child to become more independent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 December 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS WESTWOOD MBE | Chair | 19 November 2003 |
|
|||||
Lewis Richard Thomas Barnes | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANINE MARGARET BARNES MBE | Trustee | 23 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM KENNETH WOOD | Trustee | 19 November 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.67k | £105.24k | £88.97k | £96.60k | £86.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.25k | £105.82k | £92.95k | £81.34k | £105.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 NOVEMBER 2003 as amended on 29 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES TO PROVIDE THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN, WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF THEIR LIVES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR EXAMPLE, THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT AND MODIFICATIONS TO IMPROVE ACCESS AND MOBILITY OR FOR ANY OTHER PURPOSE THAT THE TRUSTEES DEEM TO BE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS OF THE CHARITY IN STOURBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
STOURBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 7131
STOURBRIDGE
DY8 9FP
- Phone:
- 07968008098
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window