BRICK CHILDREN SCHOOL (TIKATHALI)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in the Brick Fields around Kathmandu, Nepal and provides education and support services for children aged 4 to 14, of itinerant families. Provision is based at the original school site and now also at additional satellite facilities, including village schools in the Himalayan foothills from where the children come. Adult education is made available for parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nepal
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
- BCS TIKATHALI NEPAL (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR PHIL MILLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Satya Timilsina Bhattarai | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pingala Rosario | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Harper | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Charles | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Enid Astley | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN BLAKEMORE | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN JANE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TERRY WALES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.99k | £26.30k | £16.48k | £13.96k | £9.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.56k | £19.51k | £17.94k | £18.01k | £13.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT (WHETHER PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY) IN KATHMANDU, NEPAL, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 2. TO EDUCATE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS (BOTH ADULTS AND CHILDREN) BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOLS, EDUCATION AND TRAINING CENTRES IN OR AROUND KATHMANDU, NEPAL.
Area of benefit
KATHMANDU, NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Old Farm Road
Rhostyllen
WREXHAM
Clwyd
LL14 4DX
- Phone:
- 01978353769
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window