BOD SILIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides opportunities for young people,local schools and the people in the local community to engage in outdoor activities from this base. It is used as a base for schemes such as the Duke of Edinburgh Award expeditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Conwy
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 09 January 2003: Standard registration
- BOD SILYN CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
kuljit bratch | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE JAMES | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER HUGHES | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN GERRARD | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £570 | £980 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £467 | £486 | £486 | £507 | £407 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
"TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF YSGOL ABERCONWY, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE".
Area of benefit
YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF YSGOL ABERCONWY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL ABERCONWY
MORFA DRIVE
CONWY
LL32 8ED
- Phone:
- 01492593243
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window