PORTSMOUTH RACE EQUALITY NETWORK ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Portsmouth & S/E Hampshire's local (BME) Black & Minority Ethnic Communities. Activities include: Information Hub. Support for BME community groups Signposting. Advice Assisting local service providers to meet the needs of BME communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 13 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDELKARIM HAMAD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DARREN ALI | Trustee | 16 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRANDON PRINCE | Trustee | 16 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA MILLER | Trustee | 16 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Khan | Trustee | 16 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Britton | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Aysegul Epergin | Trustee | 18 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
AYSHA RAHMAN | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUNIOR ALPHONSO DAVIS | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.95k | £11.53k | £8.62k | £12.09k | £5.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £3.08k | £10.48k | £13.92k | £7.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | £12.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
1) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION; AND 2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; ESPECIALLY IN THE PORTSMOUTH, GOSPORT, FAREHAM AND HAVANT AREA
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH, GOSPORT, FAREHAM AND HAVANT AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
Victory Business Centre
Somers Road North
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 1PJ
- Phone:
- 02392877189
- Email:
- contact4preno@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window