Financial history EFFICIENT LEARNING

Charity number: 1101501
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £22.46k £19.92k £19.92k £22.68k £19.10k
Total expenditure £22.19k £10.83k £10.83k £20.55k £19.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0