SAXON COMMUNITY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social outings and gatherings for members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 30 January 2003: Standard registration
- 26 October 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.34k | £12.17k | £3.67k | £7.72k | £10.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.70k | £13.69k | £3.35k | £7.50k | £8.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 16 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 22 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 21 April 2008 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 27 September 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 27 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
A. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HERNE BAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ('HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY WORKING WITH THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B. ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. C. PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
HERNE BAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window