THE ATL TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ATL Trust Fund is a benevolent fund for the Association of Teachers & Lecturers and provides financial assistance to its members in times of hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 October 2003: Standard registration
- 05 December 2008: Removed
- 05 December 2008: Funds transferred to 1123305-1 THE NEU TRUST FUND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.01k | £134.29k | £130.16k | £147.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.73k | £167.01k | £129.06k | £117.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 21 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 21 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 17 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 17 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 02 November 2006 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 02 November 2006 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 23 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 23 August 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 2 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POOR OR DISTRESSED MEMBERS (OF ALL CATEGORIES OF MEMBERS OTHER THAN STUDENTS) OF THE ASSOCIATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN SUCH MEMBERS. (2) THE RELIEF OF POOR OR DISTRESSED WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS WHO ARE COMPLETELY OR MAINLY DEPENDENT FOR FINANCIAL SUPPORT ON THEM IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES; (3) THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE CHILDREN OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS REFERRED TO IN 4(1) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. MAINLY UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window