CENTRE FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY IN HEALTH RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 2003: Standard registration
- 12 November 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CENTRE FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF IP IN HEALTH R & D (MIHR) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £964.29k | £365.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £472.64k | £771.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 26 09 02 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION DATED 27 03 03
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF MIHR SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND ARE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TECHNICAL EXPERTISE IN THE MANAGEMENT OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FOR THE PUBLIC INTEREST AND DIRECTED TO IMPROVING THE DEVELOPMENT, INTRODUCTION AND USE OF NEW AND IMPROVED HEALTH TECHNOLOGIES. PROVIDED THAT THIS DOES NOT EXTEND TO PROMOTING DIRECTLY A CHANGE IN THE LAW OR GOVERNMENT POLICY OR THE ADMINISTRATIVE DECISIONS OF GOVERNMENT AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN GI
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window