FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, NONINGTON, KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity raises funds for the parish church of St Mary the Virgin, Nonington,Kent. It also supports local community activities within Nonington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 07 April 2003: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF NONINGTON CHURCH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH JOHN HOLNESS | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ELIZABETH WILLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD HENLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH ANTHONY COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Annelise Matharu | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.77k | £1.92k | £9.16k | £2.31k | £5.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.25k | £25.02k | £19.08k | £2.61k | £2.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED 3 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, NONINGTON, KENT IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NONNINGTON, KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CERNE HOUSE
EASOLE STREET
NONINGTON
DOVER
CT15 4EU
- Phone:
- 01304840838
- Email:
- keith.holness@sky.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window