Accounts and annual returns GERMANY TODAY THE CREATIVE CAPITAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1105951
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 24 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 16 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 18 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 18 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 September 2005 Not submitted