Accounts and annual returns NEWHAM COMMUNITY ACCOUNTING SERVICE

Charity number: 1101653
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 February 2009 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 February 2009 11 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 January 2009 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 January 2009 342 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 08 January 2009 708 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 16 February 2006 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 02 March 2006 30 days late