Accounts and annual returns L.M.J.S. BREAKFAST CLUB

Charity number: 1095147
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 28 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 28 February 2009 243 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required