CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICTS THE STROKE CLUB FOR MID-ESSEX
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to empower people disabled by a Stroke to regain independence and to re-adjust and re-integrate into family and community life. We operate a 24/7 Helpline, and a Drop-In Centre designed as a Stroke cafe for stroke survivors and their families and carers, offering information and advice, assistance with form-filling for benefits, and specialised practical problem-solving for rehabilitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 20 December 2002: Standard registration
- 20 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 20 December 2021: Funds transferred to 1008807 HEADWAY ESSEX
- THE STROKE CLUB FOR MID-ESSEX (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.80k | £6.71k | £15.29k | £3.06k | £15.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.98k | £15.88k | £15.11k | £14.92k | £14.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 23 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED 5 DECEMBER 1998, 12 MAY 2001 AND 11 MAY 2002.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND SOCIAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE HAD A STROKE AND ASSIST THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES TO RE-ADJUST AND RE-INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN THE AFTERMATH OF A STROKE 2. TO RAISE FUNDS TO FINANCE THE CLUB ACTIVITIES AND SERVICE 3. TO IDENTIFY AREAS OF CONCERN AND UNMET NEEDS OF STROKE SURVIVORS AND THEIR FAMILIES 4. TO RECRUIT VOLUNTEERS TO ASSIST WITH THE ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES OF THE CLUB 5. MEMBERSHIP OF THE CLUB SHALL BE FREE OF CHARGE.
Area of benefit
CHELMSFORD AND DISTRICTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window