GRAYS' TRUST, KERSEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees manage and administer the charity so as to fulfil its 2 objects as set out in the Scheme dated 4 December 2002, applying the charity's income to further these objects. The area of operation, or benefit, is the parish of Kersey and the surrounding area in the county of Suffolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 December 2002: Standard registration
- GRAYS TRUST KERSEY (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY ELIZABETH PEARCE | Chair | 09 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Bridget Allen | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Geoffrey Paul Clement | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Ross McQuaker | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Harris | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
HUGO SACKER | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.31k | £8.38k | £8.82k | £11.19k | £8.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.64k | £9.21k | £8.38k | £7.62k | £7.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 March 2022 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 4 DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. IF AND INSOFAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT ABOVE, IT MAY BE APPLIED IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF KERSEY, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Ancient Houses
The Street
Kersey
IPSWICH
IP7 6EA
- Phone:
- 01473 827079
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window