ANATOLIA PEOPLE'S CULTURAL CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children/Young people Elderly/Old People People with disabilities People of a particular ethnic or racial originGeneral Charitable Purposes Education/Training Arts/culture Sport/recreation Economic/Community development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 04 February 2005: Standard registration
- 06 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- APCC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.86k | £30.97k | £19.82k | £22.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.67k | £30.90k | £19.37k | £22.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF KURDISH OR TURKISH DESCENT WHO ARE RESIDENT IN LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSON.
Area of benefit
LONDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window