WORTHING COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants of up to £1500 to non profit making groups and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £10,927 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 July 2003: Standard registration
- WCP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Elizabeth Hulme | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Thorpe | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward Nowak | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rigobel Fokou | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Robinson-Viney | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|||||
MARTIN ANSELL | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOM BRETT | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.43k | £56.92k | £45.07k | £44.58k | £33.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.92k | £39.00k | £56.18k | £51.61k | £33.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.18k | £7.92k | £9.20k | £12.78k | £10.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 May 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 May 2025 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE WORTHING AREA, THROUGH INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN A PARTNERSHIP WHICH ESTABLISHES AND SUPPORTS PROJECTS THAT TACKLE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION
Area of benefit
WORTHING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worthing Community Partnership
Town Hall
Chapel Road
Worthing
BN11 1HA
- Phone:
- 01903221080
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window