Financial history MIDDLESBROUGH CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1096071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.14m £1.05m £1.01m £781.12k £847.38k
Total expenditure £1.06m £1.01m £997.81k £872.06k £881.22k
Income from government contracts £276.36k £201.42k £213.27k £186.15k £204.12k
Income from government grants £278.74k £287.31k £145.59k £345.31k £288.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.57k £120 £170 £115 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.05m £1.01m £780.60k £845.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £965 £0 £404 £1.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.01m £997.81k £872.06k £881.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £7.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £128.90k £0 £116.43k £73.96k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0