Financial history BARLBOROUGH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1095476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.79k £3.33k £9.18k £11.24k £10.92k
Total expenditure £11.48k £1.62k £4.31k £10.97k £11.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 £250