CHEPSTOW ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1096541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We carry out archaeological digs, have a full speaker and summer activity programme, provide news and resources about current happenings in archaeology via newsgroups and a website, and provide speakers on a wide range of archaeological subjects. We outreach to the local area via public lecture programmes and the Chepstow Festival.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,289
Total expenditure: £11,496

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CAS (Working name)
  • CAS GWENT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Keith Tayton Trustee 07 February 2019
None on record
Brian Powell Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
Beverly Durn Trustee 05 February 2015
None on record
HILARY PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record
FELICITY TAYLOR Trustee
None on record
GWENDOLINE HAWKESLEY Trustee
None on record
COLIN ANDREW HARRIS Trustee
None on record
SYBIL COOK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.67k £5.29k £891 £44.98k £12.29k
Total expenditure £3.93k £4.68k £1.18k £46.46k £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2022 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 LILAC DRIVE
MONMOUTH
NP25 5DY
Phone:
01600 775656