THE YOUNG OFFENDERS REHABILITATION PROGRAMME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Youth Intervention, Youth/ Parent/ Carer Counselling (Crime & ASB), Advice & Advocacy, Youth Consultation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Greenwich
Governance
- 02 April 2004: Standard registration
- 18 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YORP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200 | £195 | £220 | £110 | £158 | |
|
Total expenditure | £175 | £176 | £200 | £76 | £125 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 14 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 29 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 12 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 12 FEBRUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR OF YOUNG PEOPLE (PRINCIPALLY FROM MINORITY ETHNIC GROUPS) BETWEEN THE AGES OF 8-24 YEARS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE MANAGEMENT THINK FIT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND STATUTORY SECTORS BY DISSEMINATING BEST PRACTICES AND 'WHAT-WORKS' BY THE DELIVERY OF CONSULTATION AND PRESENTATIONAL SERVICES. (3) TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF YOUNG OFFENDERS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NEWHAM, BARKING & DAGENHAM AND KENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window