PAE-BEN & PACHODA ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise supplementary classes for children and adult. Organise workshops and seminars. Manage social events, outings and holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 August 2003: Standard registration
- 16 September 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PAE-BEN WOMEN ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £9.67k | £1.80k | £2.67k | £11.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £7.01k | £2.70k | £1.75k | £7.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 28 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 20 March 2009 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | 09 April 2008 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | 09 April 2008 | 40 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 28 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF SUDANESE WOMEN AND CHILDREN BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE INCLUDING: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (B) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS (C) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH (D) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window