M AND M FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pursuing projects in line with the trust deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Gateshead
- Salford City
Governance
- 29 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mordecai halpern | Chair |
|
||||||
MIRIAM HALPERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Moses Halpern | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £501.60k | £360.60k | £458.92k | £193.29k | £262.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £344.47k | £229.10k | £270.77k | £152.11k | £84.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £183.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £318.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £293.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £281.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £51.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE UNDER PRIVILEGED OR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND HARDSHIP IN THE JEWISH COMMUNITY 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH ORTHODOX RELIGION 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE BELIEFS AND VALUES OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 NEW HALL AVENUE
SALFORD
M7 4HR
- Phone:
- 01617928548
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window