THE IVY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 May 2003: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.61k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 12 November 2007 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 20 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING WITHIN TRADITIONAL WOODCRAFT, HORTICULTURE AND BASIC LIFE SKILLS FOR THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION OR HOMELESSNESS WITHIN THE AREA OF HERTFORDSHIRE, ENGLAND ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT").
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window