Accounts and annual returns Bolshaw PTFA

Charity number: 1096214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 July 2023 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 November 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required