Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE STROUD & COTSWOLD DISTRICTS LTD

Charity number: 1096398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £250.71k £614.04k £730.81k £693.98k £754.78k
Total expenditure £443.81k £502.86k £591.78k £554.24k £735.16k
Income from government contracts N/A £11.80k £51.82k £26.50k £1.94k
Income from government grants N/A £280.91k £314.79k £454.03k £431.41k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £84.04k £66.93k £41.04k £60.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £196 £399 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £529.74k £663.41k £652.69k £693.68k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £70 £71 £245 £956
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £50.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £434.01k £553.02k £509.00k £689.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £68.85k £38.76k £45.24k £45.45k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.15k £4.54k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £20.84k £2.10k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0