Accounts and annual returns 1ST ETHICAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1098185
Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 403 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 26 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 May 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required