Trustees MENTER CAERDYDD

Charity number: 1098606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sian Verona Meredith Poole Chair 23 November 2020
None on record
Ilan Jones Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
Ceri James Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
Elan Ial Jones Trustee 26 November 2024
None on record
Gwenno Mared George Trustee 23 November 2020
None on record
Sion Williams Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Ieuan Gwyn Roberts Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Mari Phillips Trustee 20 November 2019
None on record
Liam Ellis Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
Rhian Huws Williams Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
HUW ONLLWYN JONES Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record