HOLY CROSS CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting children ,through projects run by the Holy Cross AIDS Hospice in Emoyeni, KwazuluNatal South Africa, who have been orphaned as a result of AIDS or are suffering with AIDS or HIV positive in this deeply rural area. Currently, the charity through its support of these programs reaches out to over 500 child headed families and 1700 orphans
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wokingham
- South Africa
Governance
- 24 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
dennis millard | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS E BELLM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS B BRENNINKMEYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS B FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS P MILLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS D SIMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR S MILLARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.07k | £18.72k | £10.42k | £9.37k | £16.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.33k | £6.86k | £6.96k | £11.83k | £8.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED ADOPTED 20TH NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF CHILDREN IN KWAZULU WHO: 2.1 HAVE BEEN ORPHANED AS A RESULT OF ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS) OR HUMAN IMMUNE DEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV); OR 2.2 ARE SUFFERING WITH AIDS OR HIV AND THE TRUSTEES MAY MAKE GRANTS PRIMARILY TO THE HOLD CROSS HOSPICE, GINGINDLOVU, KWAZULU NATAL FOR THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, BEDDING MEDICAL TREATMENT AND COUNSELLING TO SUCH CHILDREN AND THE PROVISION OF ANY OTHER BENEFITS OR SERVICES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE SOUTH AFRICA, KWAZULU NATAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSCOTE
BINFIELD ROAD
WOKINGHAM
RG40 5PP
- Phone:
- 07785951047
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window