Financial history Heart of BS13 Ltd

Charity number: 1098338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £266.19k £527.57k £512.65k £522.65k £572.57k
Total expenditure £307.12k £478.53k £498.65k £443.73k £529.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £150.36k £158.06k £79.68k £46.86k £85.06k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £34.31k £14.86k £25.07k £58.25k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £493.00k £497.75k £497.22k £512.84k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £254 £47 £359 £1.47k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £478.49k £498.65k £441.30k £509.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £40 £0 £2.43k £19.64k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0