Governing document FLOURISH HOMES LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 2000 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17 MARCH 2003, 20 SEPTEMBER 2004, 7 MARCH 2005, 19 SEPTEMBER 2005, 6 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 16 MARCH 2009 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
(I) PROVIDING IMPROVED HOUSING CONDITIONS AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS THEREBY IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS; (II) PROMOTING URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (MEANING WITHIN THE MENDIP DISTRICT); (III) PROVIDING FOR THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY), OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF, HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES OF SUCH PERSON; (IV) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY), OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF, IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT, REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOUSES OCCUPIED BY THEM AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE MENDIP DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.