CITIZENS ADVICE COLCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of free, confidential, impartial and independent advice and information for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £53,580 from 1 government contract(s) and £30,830 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 29 April 2003: Standard registration
- COLCHESTER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jarvis | Chair | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Clare Tippett | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Lanston Don Ramsay | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Roberts | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Alasdair Kerr | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Ede | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.72k | £299.75k | £294.70k | £389.21k | £467.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.51k | £209.23k | £303.68k | £307.65k | £387.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | £179.38k | £297.05k | £285.00k | £386.56k | £30.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/03/2016 as amended on 26 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in Colchester and surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF COLCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citizens Advice Colchester
28 Middleborough
Colchester
CO1 1TG
- Phone:
- 0808 2787853
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window