HOMELESS IN TEIGNBRIDGE SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Relief of poverty amongst people who are, or may soon be, homeless or inadequately housed, through support programmes, advice and assistance concerning accommodation, food, clothing, hygiene and other basic needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £2,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 15 May 2003: Standard registration
- 21 October 2022: Funds received from 1141844 KINGSKERSWELL SUMMER MOON TRUST
- NARGS (Working name)
- CHRISTIANS TOGETHER, NEWTON ABBOT RENT-DEPOSIT GUARANTEE SCHEME (Previous name)
- CHRISTIANS TOGETHER, NEWTON ABBOT RENT-DEPOSIT GUARANTEE SCHEME AND TEIGNBRIDGE NIGHTSTOP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID NICHOLAS COX | Chair | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
David Matthews | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Chris Code | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MIKE GOLDSMITH | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA KIRKBY | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.54k | £57.49k | £176.64k | £123.76k | £123.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.07k | £46.02k | £58.58k | £31.30k | £59.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.55k | £1.45k | £25.00k | N/A | £2.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/11/2002 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE, OR ARE MAY SOON BE, HOMELESS OR INADEQUATELY HOUSED, THROUGH SUPPORT PROGRAMMES, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE CONCERNING ACCOMMODATION, FOOD, CLOTHING, HYGIENE AND OTHER BASIC NEEDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TEIGNBRIDGE DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbrook Farm
Kingsteignton
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 3PS
- Phone:
- 01626906371
- Email:
- info@hitsfoodbank.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window