Governing document THE DEBT ADVICE FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY 24 SEPTEMBER 2004, 16 DECEMBER 2005, 14 FEBRUARY 2007, 1 MAY 2007, 8 AUGUST 2007 AND 20 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE FREE, IMPARTIAL AND APPROPRIATE ADVICE TO PEOPLE WITH UNAFFORDABLE DEBT (2) TO HELP PEOPLE WITH DEBT PROBLEMS TO GAIN FREE ACCESS TO SOLUTIONS THAT WILL HELP THEM (3) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN MONEY MANAGEMENT SO AS TO REDUCE THE LIKELIHOOD THAT THEY WILL MIS-USE DEBT LATER IN THEIR LIVES (4) TO UNDERTAKE OR FUND RESEARCH TO UNDERSTAND WHY PROBLEM DEBT HAPPENS AND ITS EFFECT ON INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND THE WIDER UK ECONOMY (5) TO USE THIS EVIDENCE TO BECOME A FORCE FOR BENEFICIAL CHANGE WITHIN THE CREDIT AND DEBT SOLUTIONS INDUSTRY AND TO WORK WITH GOVERNMENT TO BRING ABOUT LEGISLATIVE CHANGE TO BENEFIT UK CUSTOMERS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.