LIVING WATERS CHURCH INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity number: 1102512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As a Christian Church based Charity, our prime goal is to spread freely the Gospel of Jesus Christ to all and lead those who believe into the Kingdom of God. We do this in partinership with other Christian organisations, Institutions and Churches. Our main activity therefore is sunday assemblies for Worship/Praise and Preaching of the Word of God.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £23,333
Total expenditure: £20,811

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Leicestershire
  • Liverpool City
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LWCI (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bishop Robbie Alexander Joshua CHIPHALIWALI Chair
POPAC (PRAYER OF PETITION AGAINST CANCER)
Received: On time
Aubrey Willie Kalepa Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Granger Gibson Phinjikah Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
JONATHAN MOSES SIKWESE Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Rev Morris Mpokosa Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Rev STANLEY S NDOVIE Phd Trustee
None on record
PROPHET BLESSINGS BENJAMIN CHAP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.78k £9.79k £22.70k £22.83k £23.33k
Total expenditure £6.88k £8.68k £20.65k £21.72k £20.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 November 2024 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 June 2023 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 Vincent Street
MANCHESTER
M11 2FU
Phone:
07456815557