Financial history ASSEMBLEIA DE DEUS DE LONDRES

Charity Number: 1096551
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2005 31/05/2006 31/05/2007 31/05/2008 31/05/2009
Total gross income £316.68k £449.45k £451.84k £572.87k £771.84k
Total expenditure £296.26k £243.77k £271.08k £357.77k £534.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £771.05k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £566.78k £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £6.09k £788
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £198.44k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £106.79k £241.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £70.54k £0